Home > Fairfield County Bank > History
Fairfield County Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Fairfield County Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1871-05-14 | Institution established: Original name:Ridgefield Savings Bank | |
1989-01-14 | Changed name to Ridgefield Bank | |
1992-06-10 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2004-01-01 | Changed name to Fairfield County Bank Corp. | |
2004-01-01 | Acquired Fairfield County Savings Bank (18201) in NORWALK, CT | |
2004-06-21 | Acquired Bank of Westport (34859) in WESTPORT, CT | |
2007-01-02 | Changed name to Fairfield County Bank | |
2007-01-02 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK |