Home > F & M Community Bank > History
F & M Community Bank, History
The following are major historical events for F & M Community Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1911-03-11 | Institution established: Original name:Farmers & Merchants State Bank of Preston | |
1981-12-28 | Changed name to Farmers and Merchants Bank of Preston | |
1982-02-04 | Changed name to Farmers & Merchants Bank of Preston | |
1989-08-01 | Changed name to F & M Bank of Preston | |
1994-05-01 | Changed name to F & M Community Bank | |
2002-07-01 | Changed name to F & M Community Bank, National Association | |
2002-07-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2002-07-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2002-07-01 | Acquired F & M COMMUNITY BANK, N.A. (35595) in CHATFIELD, MN |