Home > F & M Bank > History
F & M Bank, History
The following are major historical events for F & M Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1902-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Farmers and Merchants Bank | |
1970-01-01 | Changed name to Farmers & Merchants Bank | |
1995-06-24 | Acquired The Bank of Crescent (410) in CRESCENT, OK | |
1999-01-08 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2005-08-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2005-08-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2011-10-23 | Acquired F & M Bank, National Association, Oklahoma City, Oklahoma (27421) in YUKON, OK | |
2011-10-23 | Moved bank headquarters from CRESCENT, OK to EDMOND, OK | |
2011-10-27 | Changed name to F & M Bank | |
2012-06-08 | Acquired First Capital Bank (416) in KINGFISHER, OK as part of a government assisted transaction. |