Home > F&M Bank and Trust Company > History
F&M Bank and Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for F&M Bank and Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1886-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Marion County Mutualloan and Buildinga | |
1991-12-23 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
1991-12-23 | Changed name to MCM Savings Bank, F.S.B. | |
1992-12-31 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2006-01-19 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2006-09-15 | Changed name to F&M Bank and Trust Company | |
2006-09-15 | Acquired Farmers & Merchants Bank and Trust Company (1939) in HANNIBAL, MO | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2016-11-10 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2016-11-10 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2016-11-10 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD |