Home > Edmonton State Bank > History
Edmonton State Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Edmonton State Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1899-03-17 | Institution established: Original name:Edmonton State Bank | |
1982-11-22 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1983-01-01 | Acquired Bank of Summer Shade (8771) in SUMMER SHADE, KY | |
1997-05-16 | Moved bank headquarters from EDMONTON, KY to GLASGOW, KY | |
2002-06-06 | Acquired Peoples Bank of Tompkinsville (8134) in TOMPKINSVILLE, KY | |
2023-10-01 | Acquired Sumner Bank & TrustEdmonton State Bank (57954) in GALLATIN, TN. |