Home > Eastern Bank > History
Eastern Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Eastern Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1989-10-19 | Institution established: Original name:Eastern Bank | |
1989-10-19 | Acquired Eastern Savings Bank (24700) in LYNN, MA | |
1992-04-24 | Acquired Shore Bank and Trust Company (27002) in LYNN, MA | |
1992-05-15 | Acquired Malden Trust Company (8158) in MALDEN, MA | |
1993-10-12 | Acquired First Colonial Bank for Savings (23142) in LYNN, MA | |
1994-11-11 | Acquired Saugus Bank and Trust Company (9714) in SAUGUS, MA | |
1998-02-28 | Acquired The Hibernia Savings Bank (22054) in QUINCY, MA | |
2002-11-22 | Acquired Eastern Bank and Trust Company (28) in SALEM, MA | |
2003-03-31 | Moved bank headquarters from LYNN, MA to BOSTON, MA | |
2004-08-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2004-08-01 | Changed organization type to TRUST COMPANY | |
2005-05-28 | Acquired Plymouth Savings Bank (23463) in WAREHAM, MA | |
2007-05-12 | Acquired Sharon Co-operative Bank (26446) in SHARON, MA | |
2008-10-10 | Acquired MassBank (22089) in READING, MA | |
2011-03-18 | Acquired Wainwright Bank & Trust Company (27009) in BOSTON, MA | |
2012-12-01 | Acquired The Community Bank, A Massachusetts Cooperative Bank (26396) in BROCKTON, MA | |
2014-10-25 | Acquired Centrix Bank & Trust (35035) in BEDFORD, NH | |
2021-11-12 | Acquired Century Bank and Trust CompanyEastern Bank (19943) in Somerville, MA. |