Home > East West Bank > History
East West Bank, History
The following are major historical events for East West Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1972-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:East-West Federal Bank, FSB | |
1991-07-12 | Acquired Pacific Coast Federal Savings Association (33037) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA | |
1994-03-25 | Acquired Delta Federal Savings Bank (33595) in WESTMINSTER, CA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
1995-07-31 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1995-07-31 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
1995-07-31 | Changed name to East-West Bank | |
1999-05-28 | Acquired First Central Bank, National Association (26507) in CERRITOS, CA | |
2000-01-14 | Acquired American International Bank (22675) in LOS ANGELES, CA | |
2000-09-24 | Moved bank headquarters from LOS ANGELES, CA to SAN MARINO, CA | |
2001-01-12 | Acquired Prime Bank (34587) in LOS ANGELES, CA | |
2003-03-15 | Acquired Pacific Business Bank (25069) in SANTA FE SPRINGS, CA | |
2004-08-06 | Acquired Trust Bank (32080) in MONTEREY PARK, CA | |
2004-09-10 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2004-09-10 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2005-05-26 | Changed name to East West Bank | |
2005-09-07 | Acquired United National Bank (24526) in SAN MARINO, CA | |
2006-02-27 | Moved bank headquarters from SAN MARINO, CA to PASADENA, CA | |
2006-03-18 | Acquired Standard Bank (32111) in MONTEREY PARK, CA | |
2007-08-18 | Acquired Desert Community Bank (23066) in VICTORVILLE, CA | |
2009-11-06 | Acquired United Commercial Bank (32469) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2010-06-11 | Acquired Washington First International Bank (32955) in SEATTLE, WA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2014-01-18 | Acquired MetroBank, National Association (26937) in HOUSTON, TX | |
2014-01-18 | Acquired Metro United Bank (33401) in SAN DIEGO, CA |