Dollar Bank, Federal Savings Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Dollar Bank, Federal Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1855-01-01Institution established: Original name:The Dollar Savings Bank (16105)
1984-09-21FDIC certificate number changed from (16105) to
1984-10-01Acquired Continental Federal Savings and Loan Association (27781) in CLEVELAND, OH as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-01-27Changed name to Dollar Bank, Federal Savings Bank
2011-07-21Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
2017-01-01Acquired Bank @LANTEC (57730) in VIRGINIA BEACH, VA
2017-03-25Acquired Progressive-Home Federal Savings and Loan Association (27894) in PITTSBURGH, PA
2018-12-03Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK