Home > Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas > History
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, History
The following are major historical events for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, including mergers and acquisitions.
1903-03-30 | Institution established: Original name:Bankers Trust Company | |
1976-10-29 | Acquired Bankers Trust of Suffolk, National Association (7245) in PATCHOGUE, NY | |
2000-08-09 | Moved bank headquarters from NEW YORK CITY, NY to NEW YORK, NY | |
2002-04-15 | Changed name to Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas | |
2021-09-27 | Moved bank headquarters from 60 WALL STREET, NEW YORK, NY to 1 Columbus Circle, New York, NY. |