Home > Deerwood Bank > History
Deerwood Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Deerwood Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1910-03-21 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Deerwood | |
2005-07-15 | Acquired Northland Community Bank (14625) in NORTHOME, MN | |
2014-03-06 | Changed name to Deerwood Bank | |
2014-03-06 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2014-03-06 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2015-06-15 | Acquired American Bank of St. Paul (20843) in SAINT PAUL, MN | |
2018-04-28 | Moved bank headquarters from DEERWOOD, MN to WAITE PARK, MN | |
2018-04-28 | Acquired Plaza Park State Bank (12186) in WAITE PARK, MN |