Home > Dedham Institution for Savings > History
Dedham Institution for Savings, History
The following are major historical events for Dedham Institution for Savings, including mergers and acquisitions.
1831-01-01 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Dedham Institution for Savings (90186) | |
1982-01-02 | FDIC certificate number changed from (90186) to | |
1982-01-02 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1991-09-27 | Acquired MidCounty Bank and Trust Company (26843) in NORWOOD, MA | |
1996-10-03 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2018-02-23 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK |