Home > Dakota Western Bank > History
Dakota Western Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Dakota Western Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1910-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Bank of Rhame, North Dakota | |
1948-01-02 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
1948-01-02 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1976-11-15 | Changed name to The Dakota Western Bank | |
1976-11-15 | Moved bank headquarters from RHAME, ND to BOWMAN, ND | |
2001-03-10 | Acquired West River State Bank (23118) in HETTINGER, ND | |
2014-09-12 | Changed name to Dakota Western Bank |