Home > Dakota Community Bank & Trust > History
Dakota Community Bank & Trust, History
The following are major historical events for Dakota Community Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.
1940-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Security Bank of Hebron | |
1997-04-11 | Changed name to Dakota Community Bank | |
1997-04-11 | Acquired Dakota Community Bank (10233) in DICKINSON, ND | |
2005-07-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2005-07-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2005-07-01 | Changed name to Dakota Community Bank, National Association | |
2011-03-14 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2011-03-15 | Changed name to Dakota Community Bank & Trust, National Association |