Home > Dacotah Bank > History
Dacotah Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Dacotah Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1955-04-30 | Institution established: Original name:Farmers and Merchants Bank | |
1963-05-08 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1963-05-08 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
1972-09-29 | Changed name to Farmers & Merchants Bank and Trust Co. | |
1987-05-07 | Acquired First State Bank (506) in SISSETON, SD | |
1988-04-01 | Acquired The Bank of Cresbard (12642) in CRESBARD, SD | |
1995-02-01 | Changed name to Dacotah Bank | |
1997-05-24 | Acquired Dacotah Bank (11134) in CLARK, SD | |
1997-05-24 | Acquired Dacotah Bank (6072) in LEMMON, SD | |
1997-05-24 | Acquired Dacotah Bank (495) in WEBSTER, SD | |
1997-05-24 | Acquired Dacotah Bank (1677) in MOBRIDGE, SD | |
1997-05-24 | Acquired Dacotah Bank (15315) in FAULKTON, SD | |
2000-06-07 | Acquired First National Bank (3936) in HETTINGER, ND | |
2005-04-01 | Acquired DACOTAH BANK (16168) in ROLLA, ND | |
2005-04-01 | Acquired Dacotah Bank - Valley City (8945) in VALLEY CITY, ND | |
2013-09-13 | Reorganized. | |
2013-09-14 | Acquired United Farmers & Merchants State Bank (8209) in MORRIS, MN | |
2020-07-03 | Acquired First State Bank of Claremont (484) in GROTON, SD |