Home > Crossbridge Community Bank > History
Crossbridge Community Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Crossbridge Community Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1920-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Tomahawk Savings and Loan Association | |
1990-04-26 | Changed name to Tomahawk Community Bank S.S.B. | |
1993-01-01 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
2007-03-06 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2016-11-05 | Acquired Merrill Federal Savings and Loan Association (30120) in MERRILL, WI | |
2022-06-21 | Changed name to Crossbridge Community Bank. |