Home > Cornerstone Bank > History
Cornerstone Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Cornerstone Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1871-04-05 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Spencer Savings Bank | |
1978-10-31 | Acquired Warren Savings Bank (90295) in WARREN, MA | |
1985-07-08 | Became FDIC insured. | |
2017-06-12 | Changed name to Cornerstone Bank | |
2017-06-12 | Acquired Southbridge Savings Bank (23524) in SOUTHBRIDGE, MA | |
2017-10-25 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2017-10-25 | Changed primary regulatory agency from STATE to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD |