Home > CoreFirst Bank & Trust > History
CoreFirst Bank & Trust, History
The following are major historical events for CoreFirst Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.
1959-11-30 | Institution established: Original name:Commerce State Bank | |
1968-01-17 | Changed name to Commerce State Bank and Trust Company | |
1976-02-05 | Changed name to Commerce Bank and Trust | |
1988-02-18 | Acquired Commerce Towne Bank (17593) in TOPEKA, KS | |
2007-09-04 | Changed name to CoreFirst Bank & Trust | |
2007-09-21 | Acquired First United Bank, National Association (24312) in ENGLEWOOD, CO |