Home > Community Savings Bank > History
Community Savings Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Community Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1910-01-10 | Institution established: Original name:Littleport Savings Bank | |
1935-09-19 | Changed name to Community Savings Bank | |
1935-09-19 | Moved bank headquarters from LITTLEPORT, IA to EDGEWOOD, IA | |
1989-01-05 | Acquired The State Bank of Earlville (20258) in EARLVILLE, IA | |
2005-06-20 | Acquired Community Savings Bank (34484) in ROBINS, IA | |
2015-10-01 | Acquired The Garnavillo Savings Bank (10898) in GARNAVILLO, IA | |
2016-06-03 | Acquired Linn County State Bank (16311) in COGGON, IA |