Home > Community Partners Savings Bank > History
Community Partners Savings Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Community Partners Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1910-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Marion County Savings and Loan Association | |
1989-08-23 | Changed name to Marion County Savings Bank | |
1992-07-01 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
2012-09-01 | Acquired First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Pekin (30132) in PEKIN, IL | |
2015-07-10 | Acquired Pekin National Bank (19430) in PEKIN, IL | |
2018-10-26 | Changed name to Community Partners Savings Bank | |
2018-10-26 | Acquired Flora Savings Bank (27685) in FLORA, IL |