Home > Community Commerce Bank > History
Community Commerce Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Community Commerce Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1976-10-01 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Community Thrift and Loan Association | |
1985-09-10 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1995-07-09 | Moved bank headquarters from MONTEREY PARK, CA to LOS ANGELES, CA | |
1998-01-02 | Changed name to Community Commerce Bank | |
2008-11-01 | Moved bank headquarters from LOS ANGELES, CA to CLAREMONT, CA |