Home > Community Bank > History

Community Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Community Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1901-07-01Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Carmichaels
1987-09-08Changed name to Community Bank, National Association
1999-06-17Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED
2006-12-19Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS
2006-12-19Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
2006-12-19Changed name to Community Bank
2014-10-31Acquired First Federal Savings Bank (29943) in MONESSEN, PA
2016-12-13Change trust powers from LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED
2018-04-30Acquired Progressive Bank, National Association (10002) in WHEELING, WV