Home > Community Bank > History

Community Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Community Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1866-01-01Institution established: Original name:The St. Lawrence County National Bank
1971-09-10Acquired United Bank (7042) in STAR LAKE, NY
1972-03-17Acquired Bank of Gouverneur (13077) in GOUVERNEUR, NY
1972-03-17Changed name to The St. Lawrence National Bank
1974-05-17Acquired Lewis County Trust Company (615) in LOWVILLE, NY
1982-10-14Acquired First National Bank of Waterloo (7342) in WATERLOO, NY
1992-01-02Acquired Community National Bank (6935) in ADDISON, NY
1992-01-02Acquired The Exchange National Bank (25292) in OLEAN, NY
1992-01-02Acquired Horizon Bank, National Association (13685) in WATERLOO, NY
1992-01-02Acquired The Nichols National Bank (7223) in NICHOLS, NY
1992-01-02Changed name to Community Bank, National Association
2001-01-26Acquired The Citizens National Bank of Malone (7154) in MALONE, NY
2001-05-11Acquired First Liberty Bank & Trust (7537) in JERMYN, PA
2003-09-05Acquired Ogdensburg Federal Savings and Loan Association (30699) in OGDENSBURG, NY
2003-11-21Acquired Grange National Bank (7548) in LACEYVILLE, PA
2004-05-14Acquired First Heritage Bank (33913) in WILKES-BARRE, PA
2006-08-11Acquired Elmira Savings and Loan FA (28592) in ELMIRA, NY
2006-12-01Acquired Ontario National Bank (7005) in CLIFTON SPRINGS, NY
2007-06-01Acquired The Tupper Lake National Bank (7329) in TUPPER LAKE, NY
2011-04-09Acquired Wilber National Bank (7239) in ONEONTA, NY
2015-12-04Acquired The Oneida Savings Bank (15975) in ONEIDA, NY
2015-12-04Acquired State Bank of Chittenango (12940) in CHITTENANGO, NY
2017-05-12Acquired Merchants Bank (6268) in SOUTH BURLINGTON, VT
2019-07-12Acquired The National Union Bank of Kinderhook (7128) in KINDERHOOK, NY
2020-06-12Acquired Steuben Trust Company (12936) in HORNELL, NY