Home > Commercial Bank of Texas > History
Commercial Bank of Texas, History
The following are major historical events for Commercial Bank of Texas, including mergers and acquisitions.
1901-10-14 | Institution established: Original name:Commercial State Bank | |
1937-01-26 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
1937-01-26 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
1991-07-19 | Acquired Superior Savings Bank, F.S.B. (33165) in NACOGDOCHES, TX | |
1995-10-01 | Changed name to Commercial Bank of Texas, National Association | |
1998-01-30 | Acquired The Bank of East Texas, S.S.B. (29006) in LUFKIN, TX | |
2016-09-16 | Acquired The First National Bank of Emory (3188) in EMORY, TX | |
2021-04-23 |