Home > Commercial Bank > History
Commercial Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Commercial Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1962-08-29 | Institution established: Original name:Central National Bank of Alma | |
1983-09-30 | Changed name to Commercial National Bank | |
1983-09-30 | Acquired Commercial National Bank (5027) in ITHACA, MI | |
1988-05-31 | Reorganized. | |
1992-12-30 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1992-12-30 | Changed name to Commercial Bank | |
2010-07-16 | Acquired Mainstreet Savings Bank, FSB (28136) in HASTINGS, MI as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2017-01-01 | Acquired Mason State Bank (1001) in MASON, MI |