Home > Commerce Bank > History
Commerce Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Commerce Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1984-02-21 | Institution established: Original name:The Lenexa National Bank | |
1993-01-01 | Changed name to Commerce Bank, National Association | |
1994-11-19 | Acquired The Twin-City State Bank (11239) in KANSAS CITY, KS | |
1994-11-19 | Moved bank headquarters from LENEXA, KS to KANSAS CITY, KS | |
1995-07-01 | Moved bank headquarters from KANSAS CITY, KS to KANSAS CITY, MO | |
1995-07-01 | Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association (1154) in KANSAS CITY, MO | |
1995-07-01 | Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association (25253) in LEAVENWORTH, KS | |
1996-06-28 | Acquired Commerce Bank (19771) in LAWRENCE, KS | |
1996-06-28 | Acquired Commerce Bank of Barry County, National Association (1955) in CASSVILLE, MO | |
1996-06-28 | Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association (1631) in COLUMBIA, MO | |
1996-06-28 | Acquired Commerce Bank of Lebanon, National Association (1644) in LEBANON, MO | |
1996-06-28 | Acquired Commerce Bank of Joplin, National Association (1957) in JOPLIN, MO | |
1996-06-28 | Acquired Commerce Bank of St. Joseph, National Association (8577) in ST. JOSEPH, MO | |
1996-06-28 | Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association (13072) in SPRINGFIELD, MO | |
1996-10-25 | Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association (4725) in MANHATTAN, KS | |
1997-05-01 | Acquired The Shawnee State Bank (15835) in SHAWNEE, KS | |
1997-12-31 | Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association (1425) in CLAYTON, MO | |
1998-11-02 | Acquired Heritage Bank of Olathe (23211) in OLATHE, KS | |
1999-06-04 | Acquired The Citizens National Bank in Independence (13558) in INDEPENDENCE, KS | |
1999-07-08 | Acquired The Columbus State Bank (13882) in COLUMBUS, KS | |
1999-08-13 | Acquired City National Bank of Pittsburg (19408) in PITTSBURG, KS | |
2001-03-01 | Acquired The Centennial Bank (27356) in BRECKENRIDGE HILLS, MO | |
2004-08-01 | Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association (3726) in PEORIA, IL | |
2006-09-01 | Acquired West Pointe Bank and Trust Company (33222) in BELLEVILLE, IL | |
2007-04-01 | Acquired Bank South (34757) in TULSA, OK | |
2007-07-02 | Acquired Commerce Bank (22268) in AURORA, CO | |
2008-10-01 | Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association (10911) in WICHITA, KS | |
2008-10-01 | Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association (26427) in OMAHA, NE | |
2011-06-29 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2011-06-29 | Changed name to Commerce Bank | |
2011-06-29 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2013-09-01 | Acquired Summit Bank (57289) in TULSA, OK |