Home > Comenity Bank > History
Comenity Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Comenity Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1989-05-01 | Changed organization type to CREDIT CARD BANK | |
1989-05-01 | Institution established: Original name:World Financial Network National Bank | |
1997-11-17 | Moved bank headquarters from WHITEHALL, OH to GAHANNA, OH | |
2007-11-19 | Moved bank headquarters from GAHANNA, OH to COLUMBUS, OH | |
2010-08-09 | Moved bank headquarters from COLUMBUS, OH to WILMINGTON, DE | |
2011-08-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2011-08-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2011-08-01 | Changed name to World Financial Network Bank | |
2012-10-01 | Changed name to Comenity Bank |