Home > Colony Bank > History
Colony Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Colony Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1976-04-15 | Institution established: Original name:The Bank of Fitzgerald | |
2000-10-30 | Changed name to Colony Bank of Fitzgerald | |
2008-08-01 | Changed name to Colony Bank | |
2008-08-01 | Acquired Colony Bank Quitman, FSB (29723) in QUITMAN, GA | |
2008-08-01 | Acquired Colony Bank Worth (32092) in SYLVESTER, GA | |
2008-08-01 | Acquired Colony Bank Southeast (19653) in BROXTON, GA | |
2008-08-01 | Acquired Colony Bank of Dodge County (19792) in EASTMAN, GA | |
2008-08-01 | Acquired Colony Bank Wilcox (10056) in ROCHELLE, GA | |
2008-08-01 | Acquired Colony Bank Ashburn (8023) in ASHBURN, GA | |
2019-05-01 | Acquired Calumet Bank (58670) in LAGRANGE, GA | |
2021-08-01 | Acquired Southcrest Bank, National AssociationColony Bank (2124) in ATLANTA, GA. |