CNB Bank and Trust, N.A., History

The following are a list of major historical events for CNB Bank and Trust, N.A., including mergers and acquisitions.

1888-01-01Institution established: Original name:The Carlinville National Bank
1984-12-15Reorganized.
2009-02-13Acquired Corn Belt Bank and Trust Company (16500) in PITTSFIELD, IL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-16Acquired Cornerstone Bank & Trust, National Association (15317) in CARROLLTON, IL
2011-07-16Changed name to CNB Bank and Trust, N.A.
2011-07-16Acquired Palmer Bank (12103) in TAYLORVILLE, IL
2011-07-16Acquired Citizens State Bank of Shipman (5760) in SHIPMAN, IL
2019-02-15Acquired Jacksonville Savings Bank (28211) in JACKSONVILLE, IL