Home > Clear Fork Bank > History
Clear Fork Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Clear Fork Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1883-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Albany | |
1987-11-23 | Reorganized. | |
1989-05-18 | Acquired The First National Bank of Gordon (3223) in GORDON, TX | |
1989-10-05 | Acquired Strawn Security Bank (5540) in STRAWN, TX | |
2023-05-01 | Changed name to Clear Fork Bank, National Association. |