Home > CLB The Community Bank > History
CLB The Community Bank, History
The following are major historical events for CLB The Community Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1907-10-05 | Institution established: Original name:Harrisonburg-Catahoula State Bank | |
1935-04-01 | Changed name to Catahoula Bank | |
1965-11-01 | Moved bank headquarters from HARRISONBURG, LA to JONESVILLE, LA | |
1975-07-30 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1992-01-28 | Changed name to Catahoula - LaSalle Bank | |
2001-01-31 | Change trust powers from LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
2014-11-17 | Acquired Bank of Jena (8804) in JENA, LA | |
2019-12-02 | Changed name to CLB The Community Bank |