Home > Civista Bank > History
Civista Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Civista Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1884-03-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Citizens Banking Company | |
1939-11-17 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
1939-11-17 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1987-09-01 | Reorganized. | |
2002-04-01 | Acquired The Citizens National Bank of Norwalk (6664) in NORWALK, OH | |
2003-01-02 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2003-01-02 | Acquired The Castalia Banking Company (11093) in CASTALIA, OH | |
2005-10-15 | Acquired First Citizens Bank (2072) in NEW WASHINGTON, OH | |
2007-10-04 | Acquired Miami Valley Bank (16848) in LAKEVIEW, OH as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2007-12-18 | Acquired Champaign National Bank (6714) in URBANA, OH | |
2015-02-18 | Changed name to Civista Bank | |
2015-03-07 | Acquired The Citizens National Bank of Southwestern Ohio (35302) in DAYTON, OH | |
2018-09-15 | Acquired United Community Bank (29620) in LAWRENCEBURG, IN |