City National Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for City National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1953-12-04Institution established: Original name:City National Bank of Beverly Hills
1964-02-17Changed name to City National Bank
1990-06-29Acquired Warner Center Bank (23580) in LOS ANGELES, CA
1995-12-31Acquired First Los Angeles Bank (21212) in LOS ANGELES, CA
1997-01-17Acquired Frontier Bank, National Association (24491) in LA PALMA, CA
1997-01-17Acquired Ventura County National Bank (24178) in OXNARD, CA
1997-01-24Acquired Riverside National Bank (19386) in RIVERSIDE, CA
1998-01-09Acquired Harbor Bank (21581) in LONG BEACH, CA
1998-12-31Acquired North American Trust Company (27220) in SAN DIEGO, CA
1999-08-27Acquired American Pacific State Bank (20393) in SHERMAN OAKS, CA
1999-08-27Reorganized.
2000-02-29Acquired The Pacific Bank, National Association (24706) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA
2002-02-28Acquired CivicBank of Commerce (25797) in OAKLAND, CA
2007-05-01Acquired Business Bank of Nevada (34077) in LAS VEGAS, NV
2009-07-15Moved bank headquarters from BEVERLY HILLS, CA to LOS ANGELES, CA
2009-12-18Acquired Imperial Capital Bank (26348) in LA JOLLA, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-05-07Acquired 1st Pacific Bank of California (35517) in SAN DIEGO, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-05-28Acquired Sun West Bank (34785) in LAS VEGAS, NV as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-04-08Acquired Nevada Commerce Bank (35418) in LAS VEGAS, NV as part of a government assisted transaction.