Home > Citizens Tri-County Bank > History
Citizens Tri-County Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Citizens Tri-County Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1972-10-02 | Institution established: Original name:Citizens Bank of Dunlap | |
1984-05-18 | Acquired Bledsoe County Bank (21891) in PIKEVILLE, TN | |
1984-09-17 | Changed name to Citizens Bank of Dunlap and Pikeville | |
1992-07-13 | Changed name to Citizens Tri-County Bank | |
1994-09-07 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2006-08-26 | Acquired First National Bank of Tullahoma (4969) in TULLAHOMA, TN | |
2011-07-18 | Acquired Citizens Bank of Spencer, Tenn. (6092) in SPENCER, TN | |
2016-08-27 | Acquired Franklin County United Bank (57851) in DECHERD, TN |