Home > Citizens State Bank > History
Citizens State Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Citizens State Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1888-10-19 | Institution established: Original name:The Citizens National Bank of Wisner | |
2006-08-25 | Changed name to Citizens National Bank | |
2006-08-25 | Acquired The First National Bank of Belden (5385) in BELDEN, NE | |
2006-08-25 | Acquired Bank of Leigh (15266) in LEIGH, NE | |
2008-10-03 | Acquired Spalding City Bank (13891) in SPALDING, NE | |
2009-12-07 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2009-12-07 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2009-12-07 | Changed name to Citizens State Bank | |
2010-10-16 | Acquired Citizens National Bank (4620) in ARLINGTON, KS | |
2011-05-04 | Acquired The First National Bank of Friend (5404) in FRIEND, NE | |
2019-10-12 | Acquired Cass County Bank, Inc. (19645) in PLATTSMOUTH, NE |