Home > Citizens Bank of West Virginia, Inc. > History
Citizens Bank of West Virginia, Inc., History
The following are major historical events for Citizens Bank of West Virginia, Inc., including mergers and acquisitions.
1924-01-22 | Institution established: Original name:Citizens National Bank of Elkins | |
1984-02-03 | Acquired The Tucker County Bank (843) in PARSONS, WV | |
1987-04-30 | Reorganized. | |
2009-06-29 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2009-06-29 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2009-06-29 | Changed name to Citizens Bank of West Virginia, Inc. | |
2021-12-10 |