Home > Citizens Bank of Kentucky, Inc. > History
Citizens Bank of Kentucky, Inc., History
The following are major historical events for Citizens Bank of Kentucky, Inc., including mergers and acquisitions.
1910-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Second National Bank of Paintsville | |
1999-05-25 | Acquired The Bank Josephine (17508) in PRESTONSBURG, KY | |
2006-06-17 | Acquired Heritage Bank of Ashland, Inc. (34561) in ASHLAND, KY | |
2007-07-27 | Reorganized. | |
2007-07-27 | Acquired Kentucky National Bank of Pikeville (34113) in PIKEVILLE, KY | |
2014-12-22 | Acquired Peoples Security Bank (9679) in LOUISA, KY | |
2016-01-08 | Acquired Alliance Banking Company (57424) in WINCHESTER, KY | |
2016-06-30 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2016-06-30 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2016-06-30 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2016-06-30 | Changed name to Citizens Bank of Kentucky, Inc. |