Home > Citizens Alliance Bank > History
Citizens Alliance Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Citizens Alliance Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1902-07-02 | Institution established: Original name:Citizens State Bank of Clara City | |
1987-09-01 | Acquired Americana State Bank of Clara City (10177) in CLARA CITY, MN | |
1991-04-01 | Acquired Security State Bank of Maynard (16938) in MAYNARD, MN | |
2005-10-01 | Acquired First State Bank, Lake Lillian, Minnesota (1404) in LAKE LILLIAN, MN | |
2007-05-01 | Acquired Yellow Medicine County Bank (8854) in GRANITE FALLS, MN | |
2010-10-02 | Changed name to Citizens Alliance Bank | |
2011-10-15 | Acquired Security State Bank of Howard Lake (10206) in HOWARD LAKE, MN | |
2013-05-18 | Acquired First State Bank of Murdock (9734) in MURDOCK, MN | |
2014-04-26 | Acquired First Valley Bank (26190) in SEELEY LAKE, MT | |
2016-04-23 | Acquired First Bank of Lincoln (19775) in LINCOLN, MT | |
2019-08-16 | Acquired Farmers and Merchants State Bank of Sacred Heart (1901) in SACRED HEART, MN |