Home > Chickasaw Community Bank > History
Chickasaw Community Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Chickasaw Community Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1903-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First State Bank in Davidson | |
2002-01-05 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2002-01-05 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2002-01-05 | Changed name to Bank 2 | |
2002-01-14 | Moved bank headquarters from DAVIDSON, OK to OKLAHOMA CITY, OK | |
2020-01-01 | Changed name to Chickasaw Community Bank | |
2023-03-31 | Moved bank headquarters from 909 S Meridian Ave, OKLAHOMA CITY, OK to 7500 W Memorial Road, OKLAHOMA CITY, OK. |