Home > Chemung Canal Trust Company > History
Chemung Canal Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for Chemung Canal Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1833-10-22 | Institution established: Original name:Chemung Canal Trust Company | |
1974-04-30 | Acquired Montour National Bank in Montour Falls (7177) in MONTOUR FALLS, NY | |
1995-01-03 | Acquired The Owego National Bank (7243) in OWEGO, NY | |
2009-05-30 | Acquired Bank of Canton (7422) in CANTON, PA | |
2011-04-09 | Acquired Capital Bank & Trust Company (34105) in ALBANY, NY |