Home > Champlain National Bank > History
Champlain National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Champlain National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Lake Champlain National Bank of Westport | |
1959-11-20 | Moved bank headquarters from WESTPORT, NY to WILLSBORO, NY | |
1959-11-20 | Changed name to Essex County-Champlain National Bank, Willsboro | |
1986-07-31 | Changed name to Essex County-Champlain National Bank | |
1986-07-31 | Reorganized. | |
1991-03-01 | Moved bank headquarters from WILLSBORO, NY to ELIZABETHTOWN, NY | |
1991-03-18 | Changed name to Champlain National Bank |