Home > Century Next Bank > History
Century Next Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Century Next Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1905-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Ruston Building and Loan Association | |
2005-02-22 | Changed name to Bank of Ruston | |
2005-02-22 | Changed institution class to OCC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANKS | |
2005-02-22 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
2010-09-30 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2018-11-01 | Acquired First National Bank of Crossett (1757) in CROSSETT, AR | |
2019-01-15 | Changed name to Century Next Bank |