Home > Central Savings, f.s.b. > History
Central Savings, f.s.b., History
The following are major historical events for Central Savings, f.s.b., including mergers and acquisitions.
1893-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Central Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
1999-01-30 | Changed name to Central Federal Savings and Loan Association of Chicago | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2014-01-11 | Acquired Columbus Savings Bank (29416) in CHICAGO, IL | |
2014-06-23 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
2015-09-04 | Acquired American Union Savings and Loan Association, S.B. (30713) in CHICAGO, IL | |
2017-01-19 | Changed name to Central Savings, f.s.b. |