Home > Central Pacific Bank > History
Central Pacific Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Central Pacific Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1954-02-15 | Institution established: Original name:Central Pacific Bank | |
1993-05-03 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2005-02-22 | Acquired City Bank (18035) in HONOLULU, HI | |
2012-02-01 | Reorganized. | |
2025-01-24 | Institution becomes member of the Federal Reserve System. | |
2025-01-24 | Changed Bank Class to SM. | |
2025-01-24 | Changed Primary Federal Regulatory Agency from FED to FED. |