Home > CB&S Bank, Inc. > History
CB&S Bank, Inc., History
The following are major historical events for CB&S Bank, Inc., including mergers and acquisitions.
1906-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Citizens Bank & Savings Co. | |
1990-01-02 | Reorganized. | |
1990-01-02 | Changed name to Citizens Bank & Savings Company | |
1993-04-01 | Acquired First State Bank of Franklin County (1740) in PHIL CAMPBELL, AL | |
2000-09-29 | Acquired The Bank of Falkner (338) in FALKNER, MS as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2005-06-24 | Acquired The Bank of Bolivar (14671) in BOLIVAR, TN | |
2006-05-01 | Acquired Farmers Bank (1692) in CORNERSVILLE, TN | |
2008-03-03 | Changed name to CB&S Bank, Inc. | |
2013-08-23 | Acquired Community South Bank (19849) in PARSONS, TN as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2019-07-31 | Acquired PrimeSouth Bank (17892) in TALLASSEE, AL |