Home > Cambridge Savings Bank > History
Cambridge Savings Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Cambridge Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1834-04-02 | Institution established: Original name:Cambridge Savings Bank | |
1971-06-10 | Acquired North Avenue Savings Bank (90174) in CAMBRIDGE, MA | |
1991-09-20 | Acquired Bank Five for Savings (24502) in ARLINGTON, MA | |
1992-12-30 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1998-09-16 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1998-09-16 | Reorganized. | |
2002-07-17 | Change trust powers from LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2020-06-01 | Acquired Melrose Bank (26511) in MELROSE, MA |