Home > Byline Bank > History
Byline Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Byline Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1972-03-01 | Institution established: Original name:North Community State Bank | |
1979-03-14 | Changed name to North Community Bank | |
2011-03-30 | Acquired The First Commercial Bank (16488) in CHICAGO, IL | |
2011-03-30 | Acquired Edens Bank (20435) in WILMETTE, IL | |
2011-03-30 | Acquired Northwest Community Bank (58575) in ROLLING MEADOWS, IL | |
2013-06-28 | Acquired Oswego Community Bank (17899) in OSWEGO, IL | |
2013-06-28 | Acquired Archer Bank (18625) in CHICAGO, IL | |
2013-06-28 | Acquired Plaza Bank, Norridge, Illinois (18055) in NORRIDGE, IL | |
2013-06-28 | Acquired Metrobank (16641) in BERWYN, IL | |
2013-12-17 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2015-01-28 | Changed name to Byline Bank | |
2016-10-14 | Acquired Ridgestone Bank (34101) in BROOKFIELD, WI | |
2018-05-31 | Acquired First Bank & Trust (34060) in EVANSTON, IL | |
2019-04-30 | Acquired Community Bank of Oak Park River Forest (34325) in OAK PARK, IL | |
2021-06-23 | Moved bank headquarters from 180 N La Salle St, Chicago, IL to 180 N La Salle St, Chicago, IL. |