Home > Builtwell Bank > History
Builtwell Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Builtwell Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1904-05-03 | Institution established: Original name:Marion Trust and Banking Company | |
1971-02-22 | Changed name to Marion Trust & Banking Company | |
1999-01-01 | Changed name to Volunteer Bank & Trust | |
1999-01-01 | Acquired Volunteer Bank and Trust Company of Hamilton County (24824) in CHATTANOOGA, TN | |
1999-01-01 | Moved bank headquarters from JASPER, TN to CHATTANOOGA, TN | |
1999-10-31 | Changed name to First Volunteer Bank of Tennessee | |
2000-04-21 | Acquired First Volunteer Bank of Southeast Tennessee (2397) in ETOWAH, TN | |
2001-03-09 | Acquired First Volunteer Bank of Middle Tennessee (25230) in LAWRENCEBURG, TN | |
2001-05-18 | Acquired First Volunteer Bank of the Upper Cumberlands (21144) in JAMESTOWN, TN | |
2001-07-27 | Acquired First Volunteer Bank of East Tennessee (1466) in JACKSBORO, TN | |
2008-10-20 | Acquired Benton Banking Company (10696) in BENTON, TN | |
2012-05-31 | Changed name to First Volunteer Bank | |
2012-09-17 | Acquired Gateway Bank & Trust (34239) in RINGGOLD, GA |