Home > Buena Vista National Bank > History
Buena Vista National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Buena Vista National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1905-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Buena Vista National Bank of Chester | |
1999-01-01 | Acquired Bank of Evansville (12108) in EVANSVILLE, IL | |
2006-01-13 | Acquired Citizens Community Bank of Decatur (34082) in DECATUR, IL | |
2006-01-13 | Changed name to Buena Vista National Bank | |
2008-06-02 | Acquired Bank of Warrensburg (22025) in WARRENSBURG, IL | |
2012-12-01 | Acquired State Bank of Prairie du Rocher (12117) in PRAIRIE DU ROCHER, IL |