BTC Bank, History
The following are major historical events for BTC Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1919-09-19 | Institution established: Original name:The Bethany Trust Company | |
1991-06-28 | Reorganized. | |
1998-10-30 | Acquired Bank of Gallatin/First State Bank (8288) in GALLATIN, MO | |
1999-09-20 | Changed name to BTC Bank | |
2019-05-17 | Acquired The Bank of Fairport (9377) in MAYSVILLE, MO | |
2021-10-15 | Acquired Home Exchange BankBTC Bank (8884) in JAMESPORT, MO. | |
2021-11-04 | Acquired 1st Cameron State BankBTC Bank (32487) in CAMERON, MO. | |
2022-10-07 | Acquired The Merchants and Farmers Bank of SalisburyBTC Bank (8259) in SALISBURY, MO. |