Home > Bruning Bank > History
Bruning Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Bruning Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1891-09-01 | Institution established: Original name:Bruning State Bank | |
1908-03-29 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANDFATHERED | |
2003-03-15 | Acquired The Commercial State Bank (18782) in CLAY CENTER, NE | |
2019-08-12 | Changed name to Bruning Bank | |
2020-01-14 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANDFATHERED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED |